Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Roman-Wilkie, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2019 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE
Date: March 10, 2021JURY TRIAL PROGRESS REPORT, FILED IN OPEN CT
Date: February 22, 2021VERDICT: NOT GUILTY
Date: February 22, 2021JURY PANEL USAGE RECORD, FILED IN OPEN COURT
Date: February 22, 2021CASE SET FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: November 17, 2020JURY INSTRUCTIONS, FILED IN OPEN COURT
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: September 25, 2020PRE-TRIAL STATUS SHEET
Date: August 10, 2020UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: August 24, 2020UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: August 10, 2020STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 07, 2020PRETRIAL STATUS SHEET
Date: July 14, 2020DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE OF BRADY MATERIAL
Date: August 07, 2020CDP REJECTION SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: January 14, 2020NOTICE OF PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST
Date: March 18, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: March 11, 2020NOTIFICATION OF COUNTY DIVERSION REJECTION
Date: January 14, 2020REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE- BREATH TEST REFUSAL
Date: November 19, 2019WAIVER OF APPEARANCE/CONSENT TO CONTINUANCE AND WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL
Date: November 22, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: February 04, 2020NOTICE OF JUDICIAL NOTICE REQUEST
Date: November 19, 2019CASE SET FOR PRETRIAL. NOTICE SENT
Date: October 23, 2019STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT RE" DRIVING UNDER THE INFLUENCE
Date: November 19, 2019NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST
Date: November 19, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WRITTEN PLEA WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: October 23, 2019DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: October 23, 2019ORIGINAL TRAFFIC CITATION FILED
Date: September 25, 2019INFORMATION PERTAINING TO THE CASE
Date: October 11, 2019CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE
Date: September 23, 2019SURETY BOND AA19-592435 POSTED $500.00
Date: September 23, 2019INFORMATION PERTAINING TO THE CASE
Date: September 23, 2019ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: September 24, 2019COPY OF CITATION
Date: September 23, 2019CITATION FILED A0ZODOP
Date: September 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.