Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ratliff, Chelsea Anne, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2019 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTFICATION OF COUNTY DIVERSION REVOCATION
Date: January 06, 2020VIOLATION OF PROBATION FILED AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: December 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.