Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Otero-Rivera, Christopher J, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with CARSTEN, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARSTEN, KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 216 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
STATUS HEARING CANCELLED REMAINS AS SET FOR MOTION TO SUPPRESS/ PRE-TRIAL (PER EMAIL)
Date: September 24, 2020PRAECIPE FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA
Date: September 30, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: September 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2051 | Docket Event | ||
March 28, 2038 | Docket Event | ||
March 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.