Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Glover, John Curtis, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with CARSTEN, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARSTEN, KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
FELONY SENTENCE ORDER - RECORDED (OR.5874.714. / 2021009009)
Date: January 20, 2021FIRST APPEARANCE CXL -PLEAD PRIOR TO HEARING
Date: January 20, 2021RESTITUTION ORDER/NAME AND ADDRESS OF VICTIM (2 PAGE)
Date: January 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.