Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Cardona, Rene Jr, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with MORGAN, JON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORGAN, JON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2019 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: March 17, 2021NOLLE PROSEQUI: ALL COUNTS
Date: March 16, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: November 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.