Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Laputka, Mitch D, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with MORGAN, JON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORGAN, JON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 12, 2019 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: January 25, 2021PLEA OF NO CONTEST/NOLO CONTENDERE
Date: January 22, 2021SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF PRIOR CONVICTION & CRIMINAL HISTORY
Date: January 10, 2021CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW(NO BLANK ORDER)
Date: December 04, 2020RESET NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL
Date: December 15, 2020ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT REGISTRY ATTORNEY; CHARLES TAYLOR
Date: December 14, 2020MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: December 10, 2020CAPIAS RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: December 01, 2020ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: December 01, 2020INFORMATION FILED
Date: August 21, 201912/4/2020
Date: April 02, 20241/25/2021
Date: April 02, 202412/15/2020
Date: April 01, 202412/14/2020
Date: April 01, 202412/11/2020
Date: April 02, 20241/26/2021
Date: April 05, 20241/25/2021
Date: April 01, 20241/22/2021
Date: April 04, 202412/10/2020
Date: April 02, 202412/9/2020
Date: April 01, 20241/20/2021
Date: April 02, 20241/19/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/14/2019
Date: April 01, 202412/1/2020
Date: April 01, 20241/10/2021
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.