Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Florida, filed a(n) 3 case against Frank Reinaldo Morales, represented by Jeffery Lotter, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Eric H DuBois presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEric H DuBois Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 12, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
|
Transmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond
Date: March 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Hearing | CANCELED-Case Closed Prior to Hearing Trial - Gibson, Elizabeth | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
HEARING - CANCELED-Case Closed Prior to Hearing Trial - Gibson, Elizabeth
Judge: Carly S Wish |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Transmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond
Judge: Carly S Wish |
|
August 17, 2021 | Hearing | CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H | |
July 15, 2021 | Hearing | Status Hearing - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H) | |
June 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint
Judge: Eric H DuBois |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.