Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Florida, filed a(n) 3 case against Miriam Louise Larry, represented by Office Of Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Eric H DuBois presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEric H DuBois Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
|
Correspondence from Defendant Re: Collections
Date: May 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Converting Financials to Community Service Comments: HGU 04/23/2022 - Complete 60 hours of ACS for all cases - Order Dated 04/23/2022
Judge: Carly S Wish |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Defendant Re: Collections
Judge: Carly S Wish |
|
August 09, 2021 | Hearing | CANCELED-Case Closed Prior to Hearing Pre-Trial Conference - DuBois, Eric H | |
June 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint
Judge: Eric H DuBois |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.