Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Joseph Rotella, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jonathan Rotstein, against Otoniel Amador, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Thomas Knight, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Denise Kim Beamer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Kim Beamer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryCa - Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Summons Returned Unserved
Date: October 07, 2020Summons Returned Served
Date: November 04, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form
Judge: Denise Kim Beamer |
|
May 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: Denise Kim Beamer |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement
Judge: Denise Kim Beamer |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED
Judge: Denise Kim Beamer |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance
Judge: Denise Kim Beamer |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition(s)
Judge: Denise Kim Beamer |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition(s)
Judge: Denise Kim Beamer |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition(s)
Judge: Denise Kim Beamer |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement
Judge: Denise Kim Beamer |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition(s)
Judge: Denise Kim Beamer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.