Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tonetta Ward, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dane Jordan, against Pennsylvania Lumbermans Mutual Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Paetra Brownlee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaetra Brownlee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2020 |
CategoryCa - Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Tonetta Ward against Pennsylvania Lumberman's Mutual Insurance Company. The complaint states that the action is for damages exceeding $30,000, exclusive of costs, interest, and attorneys' fees. The estimated value of the cl...
Correspondence
Date: October 16, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 24, 2020Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: July 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Disclosure of Experts
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certification Settlement Authority
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objection
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production of Non-Party
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.