Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Shelby Resorts Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Courtney Shipley, against Michelle Warner, Simon Warner, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Jeffrey L Ashton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey L Ashton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2018 |
CategoryCa - Breach Of Agreement/Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Final Judgment
Date: March 05, 2018Final Judgment
Date: March 05, 2018Correspondence
Date: October 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Lack of Prosecution/Motion to Dism/Notice Hearing
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Military Service
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned Posted
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Unserved
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.