Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Stephanie Leigh Bellah, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Bret David Bellah, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Mark S Blechman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S Blechman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2017 |
CategoryProceeding To Est Administrative Support Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Report and Recommendation of Magistrate
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Income Deduction
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Social Security
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Administrative Support Order
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Demographic Information Sheet
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Initiated
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Proceeding to Establish Administrative Support Ord
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Mark S Blechman |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.