Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Grisel Hernandez, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scot Strems, against Castle Key Insurance Company, represented by Darryl Gavin, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Reginald K Whitehead presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReginald K Whitehead Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2017 |
CategoryCa - Breach Of Agreement/Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Grisel Hernandez against Castle Key Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the 9th Judicial Circuit in Orange County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that they suffered a loss due to water discharge in the kitchen, which ...
Correspondence
Date: March 26, 2019Joint Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: September 26, 2018Order of Dismissal
Date: March 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Reginald K Whitehead |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Reginald K Whitehead |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal
Judge: Reginald K Whitehead |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal
Judge: Reginald K Whitehead |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal
Judge: Reginald K Whitehead |
|
March 26, 2018 | Hearing | CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - LeBlanc, Bob | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - LeBlanc, Bob
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Witness List
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Witness and Exhibit List
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.