Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Takara Diane Quinn, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Jeremiah Rhym, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Greg A Tynan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreg A Tynan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2011 |
CategoryChild Support Dor |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Greg A Tynan |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Greg A Tynan |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Greg A Tynan |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Greg A Tynan |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Denying
Judge: Greg A Tynan |
|
January 30, 2017 | Hearing | Contempt - Hepner, Barry (Actual: Hepner, Barry) | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Contempt - Hepner, Barry (Actual: Hepner, Barry)
Judge: Greg A Tynan |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Demographic Information Sheet
Judge: Greg A Tynan |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Greg A Tynan |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail
Judge: Greg A Tynan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.