Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Omar Rojas, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Nichole Clements, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Vincent S. Chiu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent S. Chiu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2009 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Disposal of Exhibits
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Disposal Listing
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
October 01, 2018 | Hearing | Motion - Wilson, Tanya Davis (Actual: Wilson, Tanya Davis) | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Motion - Wilson, Tanya Davis (Actual: Wilson, Tanya Davis)
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Child Support Guideline Worksheet
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
June 19, 2018 | Hearing | Motion - Wilson, Tanya Davis (Actual: Wilson, Tanya Davis) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.