Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lakeisha Nicole Daniels, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Frank Howard, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Heather L Higbee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHeather L Higbee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2009 |
CategoryChild Support Dor |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denying
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
October 12, 2020 | Hearing | Contempt - Groves, Christine E. (Actual: Groves, Christine E.) | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Contempt - Groves, Christine E. (Actual: Groves, Christine E.)
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arrearage Affidavit
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Department of Revenue Intercept Credit
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.