Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Myrtle L Cruey filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Janet C Thorpe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet C Thorpe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2009 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(s) Sent to Judge
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Copy of Trust
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Observation Sheet Comments: RETURNED
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Observation Sheet
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement Regarding Creditors
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.