Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barbara Anne Schubert Renaud Barbara A Renaud Aka filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Janet C Thorpe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet C Thorpe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2008 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Discharge
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(s) Sent to Judge
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Observation Sheet
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Waiver, Consent & Receipt of Beneficiary
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
|
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Petition or Motion for Discharge
Judge: Janet C Thorpe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.