Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jefferson Weeks Johnson, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Lucy D Hadi, Diane R James, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with John H Adams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn H Adams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryCa - Habeas Corpus (Crim/Juv) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Original Appeal Record Returned from 5th DCA Comments: Original Appeal Record Returned from 5th DCA|ORIGINAL APPEAL RECORD RETURNED FROM 5TH DCA | |
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Order Comments: Order|DCA ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Record on Appeal Mailed Comments: Record on Appeal Mailed |RECORD ON APPEAL MAILED (HABEAS CORPUS) | |
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment Comments: Acknowledgment|ACKNOWLEDGMENT NOTICE OF APPEAL (5D06-883) | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM DCA TO CLERK (WITH ATTACHED COPY OF NOTICE OF APPEAL) | |
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal Comments: Notice of Appeal|NOTICE OF APPEAL (HABEAS) | |
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event | Order Denying Comments: Order Denying|ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Initial Judge Assigned Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED ADAMS, J H 16 | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition Comments: Petition|PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.