Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Frederick Reinwald, filed a(n) Ca - Mandamus case against Orange County Corrections Division, Timothy P Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with John H Adams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn H Adams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2005 |
CategoryCa - Mandamus |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2005 | Docket Event | Order Comments: Order|ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S REQUEST TO BE DECLARED INDIGENT FOR PURPOS OF APPEAL | |
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event | Order Comments: Order|ORDER ON PETITIONER'S REQUEST REGARDING DOCUMENTS AND NOTIFICATION OF INDIGENCY TO FIFTH DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL | |
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Letter Comments: Letter|LETTER TO JUDGE FROM PLTF FREDERICK REINWALD (PRO SE) | |
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Motion Comments: Motion |PLTF FREDERICK REINWALD (PRO SE) MOTION TO BE DECLAIRED INDIGENT FOR THE PURPOSE OF APPEAL | |
September 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Comments: Notice of Change of Address|NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FREDERICK REINWALD | |
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event | Final Judgment Comments: Final Judgment|FINAL JUDGMENT/ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED AND RECORDED | |
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice Comments: Notice|NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONS E TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS BY ORANGE COUNTY (WRIT 05 58) | |
August 26, 2005 | Docket Event | Response Comments: Response|ORANGE COUNTY RESPONSE TO PETITION WRIT OF MANDAMUS W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT S | |
August 23, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition or Motion to Extend Time Comments: Petition/Motion to Extend Time|DEFT ORANGE COUNTY MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (FAX) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.