Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Leron Redfin Zeke Redfin Aka, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Florida Parole Commission Control Release Authorit, State Of Florida, James V Crosby, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with John H Adams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn H Adams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2005 |
CategoryCa - Habeas Corpus (Crim/Juv) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Final Judgment Comments: Final Judgment|ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (RECORDED--CLOSES CASE) | |
April 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Response Comments: Response|FLORIDA PAROLE COMMISSIONS RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS | |
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition or Motion to Extend Time Comments: Petition/Motion to Extend Time|FLORIDA PAROLE COMMISSION MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO THE COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Order Granting Comments: Order Granting|ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Letter Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY BRADLEY R BISCHOFF | |
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Order Granting | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition or Motion to Extend Time Comments: Petition/Motion to Extend Time|FLORIDA PAROLE COMMISSIONS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO THE COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS | |
February 11, 2005 | Docket Event | Order or Rule to Show Cause Comments: Order/Rule to Show Cause|ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED ON FLORIDA PAROLE COMMISSION 20 DAYS | |
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event | Initial Judge Assigned Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED ADAMS, J H 16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.