Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Campbell, Amber, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Caballero, Lazaro, Eagle Island Ranch Llc, Unlimited Turf Llc, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TEMPORARY TIMESHARING SCHEDULE, CHILD SUPPORT, ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND INJUNCTION | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EAGLE ISLAND RANCH, LLC C/O LAZARO CABALLERO SERVED 9-26-2022 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - LAZARO CABALLERO SERVED 9-26-2022 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNLIMITED TURF, LLC C/O LAZARO CABALLERO SERVED 9-26-2022 | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO EAGLE ISLAND RANCH, LLC 9/26/2022 | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO UNLIMITED TURF LLCX 9/26/2022 | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO LAZARO CABALLERO 9/26/2022 | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 472022DR000307DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/22/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.