Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nodal, Osana, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2022 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | FORMAL NOTICE | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 118548 | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 472022CP000208CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/11/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.