Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Santare, Patricia, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2022 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO FREEZE DECEDENT'S ASSETS AT UBS FINANCIAL | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 472022CP000197CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/29/2022 | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 118278 | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.