Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dale, Lisa Virginia, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2022 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PAID FUNERAL BILL | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | FORMAL NOTICE | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 472022CP000191CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/27/2022 | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 118190 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.