Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Prieto, Alvino, Prieto, Ana Romero, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE/LEARNER'S LICENSE FOR ERIN LYNN PRIETO, ANA PRIETO, AND ALVINO PRIETO | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE OF ANA PRIETO | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE RE-ASSIGNED | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC REL HRG scheduled on 4/28/2021 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge JAMES MCCANN presiding. | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING REMOTE HEARING 4/28/2021 AT 2 PM | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | FDLE BACKGROUND CHECK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.