Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Florida Gas Transmission Compa, filed a(n) Other case against Celeste Watford Okeechobee Cou, Leon M Biegalski Executive Dir, Mickey L Bandi Okeechobee Co P, represented by Masterson, Stephen Michael, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Laurie E. Buchanan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurie E. Buchanan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2017 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT STIPULATION WITH DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER OF REFERRAL TO NONBINDING ARBITRATION | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO NONBINDING ARBITRATION | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / PRE TRIAL | |
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 12/19/2017 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge LAURIE BUCHANAN presiding. | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER 2ND AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / PRE TRIAL | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/PRE-TRIAL (TO INCLUDE ALL CONSOLIDATED CASES) | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 11/9/2017 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge LAURIE BUCHANAN presiding. | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/PRE-TRIAL 11/9/2017 AT 9 AM | |
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.