Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Perdomo, Robert, Perdomo, Teresa, filed a(n) Other case represented by Shochet, Randall Mark, against State Farm Florida Insurance C, represented by Norton, Walter William, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Laurie E. Buchanan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurie E. Buchanan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORDED 4DCA MANDATE RE: AFFIRMED | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- RECORD ON APPEAL | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $136.50 Receipt Number MX 84992 | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | 4DCA ORDER RE: APPELLANT TO FILE STATUS REPORT | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY OF INVOICE - RECORD ON APPEAL | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $108.50 | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY OF MEMORANDUM PENDING PAYMENT FOR APPEAL RECORD | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | 4DCA ORDER RE: APPEAL IS REINSTATED | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | 4DCA ORDE RE: APPEAL DISMISSED | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $100.00 Receipt Number MX 73917 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.