Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gray, Bernard Jr, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Udell, Harran Eric, against Walpole Feed And Supply Co, represented by Harber, Stephen Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sweet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sweet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence- Premises Liability Commercia |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOCATIONAL ASSESSMENT EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.