Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brigner, Michael, Brigner, Deborah Ann, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lefebvre, Gerald Alan, against Ranger Construction Industries, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Laurie E. Buchanan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurie E. Buchanan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF THE DEPOSITION OF FRANK FORE | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | NON-BONDING ARBITRATOR'S DECISION | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ARBITRATOR'S DECISION UNDER SEAL | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.