Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bliss, Thomas, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Arnesen, Jay, against Tower Hill Preferred Insurance, represented by Eckard, John E., in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sweet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sweet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2016 |
CategoryOther-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/OR ABATE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING POLICY EFFECTIVE 10/19/2015 TO 10/19/2015 | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 2/3/2017 @ 10:00 AM ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.