Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Villacis, Raul, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Shiver, Michael Walker, against Jnz Hotels Inc, represented by Koven, Ian L, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Laurie E. Buchanan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurie E. Buchanan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence- Premises Liability Commercia |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FOR PLAINTIFF, RAUL VILLACIS' ACTION AGAINST THE DEFENDANT, JNZ HOTELS, INC. | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING CIVIL JURY TRIAL | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE-PRETRIAL SETTING TRIAL ON 3/4/2019 @ 9:30 AM | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 3/4/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge LAURIE BUCHANAN presiding. | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/PRE-TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.