Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Td Bank Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Healy, Patrick Francis, against Okeechobee Utility Authority, Tenant No 1, Unknown, Broadcast Music Inc, Aliff, Joan, Aliff, Lacy B, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sweet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sweet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2016 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Commercial $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL SENT TO WENDELL COWART, INDIVIDUALLY AND FOR BREWSKI'S RESTAURANT & LOUNGE, INC. - CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT SERVICE | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | INTENT TO BID FORM - SPACE COAST REAL ESTATE SERVICES, LLC | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | INTENT TO BID FORM - DAG INTERNATIONAL GROUP | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | INTENT TO BID FORM - DAVID FELTENBERGER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.