Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Collier, Robin E, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Delgado, Javier, against American Sercurity Insurance C, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sweet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sweet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2015 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE WITH RESERVATION FOR THE COURT'S DETERMINATION OF PLAINTIFF'S REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT'S ORDER | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SCRIVENER'S ERROR AND PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ALL NON-ATTORNEY/CLIENT OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT'S DECEMBER 12, 2016 ORDER | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.