Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fairchild, Kenneth, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lynch, James Tyrone, against Bulk Express Transport Inc, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sweet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sweet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE DATED 8/17/2016 FROM ALEX D. BARKER | |
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE RE: CASE HAS SETTLED, 9/2/2016 TRIAL CANCELLED | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUATION OF TRIAL | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.