Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mercer, Howard, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Levy, Chad Evan, against Ok Corral Guns Inc, represented by Rodman, Andrew Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2015 |
CategoryOther-Discrimination Employment/Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PROPOSED ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) | |
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00 | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Case 472015CA000260CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/20/2015 | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO OK CORRAL GUNS INC | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FOR OK CORRAL GUNS INC (PROPOSED) | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.