Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Farmer, Charles, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Onsoy, Alisan, Capital Traders And Investment, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2015 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT | |
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO GALER YISLICAYIR FOR CAPITAL TRADERS AND INVESTMENTS LLC 4/13/15 | |
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EXECUTED ON ALISAN ONSOY ON 4/20/2015 | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 34367 | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ALISON ONSOY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.