Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Barnes, Kimberlie E, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brotman, Marc Charles, against Cardenas Molina, Jose Alfonso, Sunridge Harvesting Co, represented by Cohen, Lee Miller, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sweet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sweet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF 11/3/2015 UNIFORM MOTION CALENDAR HEARING | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DISCOVERY DEPOSITION SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM | |
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNIFORM MOTION CALENDAR HEARING 11/3/2015 @ 9:00 AM ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE | |
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 11/3/2015 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge GARY SWEET presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.