Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
B & Z Diving Services Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Monchick, Michael Jay, against Dickerson Florida Inc, represented by O'Neill, Eugene J, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sweet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sweet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2014 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CROSS-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON ANTOINETTE PETERSON AS EXECUTIVE ASSISTANT AND AUTHORIZED REPRESENTATIVE OF DICKERSON FLORIDA, INC. FOR LARRY DALE ON 12/30/2014 | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.