Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Economys, Peter, P M Okeechobee Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Willbur, Dean L, against Duffy, Keith, Energis Petroleum Llc, represented by Mersky, Scott Alan, Mittelberg, Barry Steven, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Laurie E. Buchanan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurie E. Buchanan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2012 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE DATA SHEET (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | ENERGIS PETROLEUM, LLC'S CONSENT TO WITHDRAWAL | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF'S APPELLATE ATTORNEY FEES | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S POST TRIAL MOTIONS | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF 3/23/2017 HEARING | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE CHECK-IN RECEIPT - PLAINTIFF | |
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event | SPECIALLY SET - NOTICE OF HEARING 3/23/2017 @ 10:10 AM ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ATTORNEYS FEES (TRIAL FEES ONLY) | |
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 3/23/2017 at 1010 AM, MX - Judge LAURIE BUCHANAN presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.