Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Boswell, Jaylen, Boswell, Kizzy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Vastola, Jeff, against Okeechobee County Board Of Cou, W & W Lumber & Building Suppli, represented by Alexander, Jeffrey Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Elizabeth A. Metzger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth A. Metzger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2012 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL | |
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION | |
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE DATED 10/3/13 FROM JOHN W. LEWIS | |
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT, OKEECHOBEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS | |
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF MINOR'S SETTLEMENT WITHOUT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE DATED 9/18/2013 FROM JEFF D. VASTOLA, ESQ. | |
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF MINOR'S SETTLEMENT WITHOUT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.