Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ics Computers Inc, World Electric Supply Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Barthet, Alexander Edward, against Dooleymack Constructors Llc, Mcdade, John, Phoenix Electric Company Inc, Safeco Insurance Company Of, represented by Dooley, William Amborn, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2011 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE DATED 05112012 FROM | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMARY JUDGMENT (AGAINST PHOENIX ELECTRIC CO. INC.) | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | DEVIN R. MAXWELL | |
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ELECTRIC COMPANY INC. | |
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN MCDADE PRESIDENT OF PHOENIX | |
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (05/10/2012 1:30 PM) | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.