Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Big Lake Home Health Services, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Brew, George Kellen, against Visiting Nurse Association Of, represented by Tierney, Thomas Warren, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sweet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sweet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2010 |
CategoryOther-Business Transactions |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE DATED 3/3/14 FROM SHARON BROWN, CP, FCP, FRP | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | FAXED CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE DATED 2/18/14 FROM THOMAS W. TIERNEY | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | COPY OF ORDER DIRECTING PRE-TRIAL PROCEDURE WITH NOTE "SETTLED" | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT OF MEDIATOR | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.