Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cantrill, Edna M, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Rotstein, Jonathan Isaac, against Walmart Stores Inc, represented by Tarlow, David Michael, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence- Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
September 17, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVEDOKEECHOVEE HOSPITAL MEDICAL RECORDS CUST. | |
September 17, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVEDDR STELLA CROSS | |
September 17, 2008 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION RETURNED | |
September 04, 2008 | Docket Event | MEDIATION ADR REPORT | |
August 27, 2008 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE MCMANUS FROM JONATHAN I. ROTSTEIN | |
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event | SUB SERVEDRADIOLOTY RECORDS CUSTODIAN FOR BEACHES | |
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event | MRI | |
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION RETURNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.