Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with POLSON, MARY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePOLSON, MARY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - RECORDED (OR.3527.4613. / 3432754) | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: WEEKS, RACHEL D; WEEKS, DERRICK SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021 DR 000004 F, WEEKS, RACHEL D VS. WEEKS, DERRICK ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: FJDM-2/23/2021 | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE & WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ANSWER & WAIVER | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF HUSBAND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.