Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with BROWN, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBROWN, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryNotice Of Trust |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSOLIDATED TO 2022 CP 000835 F | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | OCAD 2021-11 CIRCUIT AND COUNTY COURT DIVISION ASSIGNMENTS | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE STONE, WILLIAM F: ASSIGNED | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: FISHER, J MARK SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021 CP 001383 F, THE ESTATE OF: STRAUB, PETER B ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: CORES-10/28/2021 | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM ASCENSION POINT | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: FISHER, J MARK SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021 CP 001383 F, THE ESTATE OF: STRAUB, PETER B ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SCLA-10/22/2021 | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,371.71 FROM CAPITAL ONE NA WALMART REWARDS CARD | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER FROM ATTY | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $41.00 RECEIPT #2021038894 | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.