Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with BROWN, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBROWN, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategorySummary Admistration > $1,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: FLEET, H BART SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021 CP 001342 F, THE ESTATE OF: SOULE, JOHN RUSSELL ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SCLA-2/9/2022 | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $2910.35/ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC OBO SYNCHRONY BANK | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - RECORDED (OR.3599.3298. / 3520904) | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | OCAD 2021-11 CIRCUIT AND COUNTY COURT DIVISION ASSIGNMENTS | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE STONE, WILLIAM F: ASSIGNED | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF PUBLISHED/1ST DATE PUBLISHED: 9/15/2021 | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.