Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with BROWN, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBROWN, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF CLAIM | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM OF USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF CLAIM | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | FORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | OCAD 2021-11 CIRCUIT AND COUNTY COURT DIVISION ASSIGNMENTS | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE STONE, WILLIAM F: ASSIGNED | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | INVENTORY IN THE AMOUNT OF: CONFIDENTIAL | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.