Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with STONE, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | **CASE CLOSED** | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLF RT-DESTIN ASSOCIATES LLC'S MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION - RECORDED (OR.3625.2534. / 3554774) | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLF RT-DESTIN ASSOCIATES LLC'S MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLF'S MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION BUT CONSOLIDATING THIS CASE INTO 2021 CA 2906 F - RECORDED (OR.3621.2559. / 3549571) | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT RESULT: MOTION HEARING SET FOR 05/02/2022 AT 2:30 PM - COURT EVENT DISPOSED | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSOLIDATED TO 2021 CA 002906 F | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLF'S MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION BUT CONSOLIDATING THIS CASE INTO 2021 CA 2906 F | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLF'S MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION BUT CONSOLIDATING THIS CASE INTO 21 CA 2906 F ***APPEARS TO BE A DUPLICATE*** | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: BRYAN, KIMBERLY SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021 CA 002919 F, NEXPOINT REAL ESTATE ADVISORS LP VS. RT DESTIN ASSOCIATES LLC ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: ODEN-5/11/2022 | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.