Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with FLOWERS, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFLOWERS, MICHAEL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryQuiet Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ORDERING ATTORNEYS FEES - RECORDED (OR.3680.382. / 3630584) | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ORDERING ATTORNEYS FEES | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 07/25/2022 AT 11:15 AM IN ZOOM/ , JDG: KETCHEL, TERRANCE R | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL MASTER AND AMENDED MOTION TO DETERMINE ATTORNEY'S FEES (PLF) | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR ROO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.